HI HB442 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the limited liability protections against trespasser lawsuits to qualifying owners of four or less acres of agricultural land.
Title
Trespass; Agricultural Land
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-13 9:45AM in conference room 312. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-11-13 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=442&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB442_.HTM |