HI HB413 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB413
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to conduct a survey of available state-owned and state-managed housing units that could be used to provide affordable rental housing. Requires the Department of Human Services to convene a homeless summit. Appropriates funds for convening the homeless summit. (HB413 HD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 327) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB413 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).