HI HB404 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires premises licensed under chapter 281, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to have a sign posted on or about the premises, including women's restrooms, that notifies persons of the risks of birth defects for women drinking alcoholic beverages during pregnancy. Effective January 1, 2050. (HB404 HD1)
Title
Warning Signs; Alcohol Consumption; Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13 at 10:30AM. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB531 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.