HI HB401 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:20PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:20PM in Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any person who is eligible to vote and applies for a new or renewed motor vehicle driver's license, provisional license, or instruction permit, or a new, renewed, or duplicate identification card be automatically registered to vote if that person is not already registered to vote unless the applicant affirmatively declines to be registered to vote. Authorizes access to and electronic transmission of databases maintained or operated by the counties or the department of transportation containing driver's license or identification card information to election officials and the statewide voter registration system. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Automatic Voter Registration; Driver's License; Identification Card; Affirmative Opt-out
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:20PM in Conference Room 325. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-16 2:20PM in conference room 325. |
2016-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 679). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; K.Kahele. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, Lowen Co-Chairs; Takayama, McDermott. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 499) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3569) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-31-16 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2368) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 181). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, McDermott. |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-03-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |