HI HB401 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for certain social services programs formerly funded under the temporary assistance for needy families program. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB401 HD1)
Title
Keiki Caucus; Department of Human Services; Social Services; Appropriation; TANF ($)
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 312) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |