HI HB364 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the State's automatic deduction of ten per cent of the gross proceeds of a county's surcharge on state tax to a deduction of an unspecified amount to reimburse the state for costs associated with handling the assessments, collection, and disposition of the county surcharge on state tax. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB364 HD2)
Title
County Surcharge on State Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 429) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Ing, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-11-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-02-06 | House | Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2013-02-06 | House | Recommitted to TRN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Say, Souki excused. |
2013-02-06 | House | Recommends recommittal to TRN. |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 162) as amended in HD 1. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Nakashima, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Takumi. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |