HI HB360 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the funding formula for candidates in the Pilot Comprehensive Public Funding Program to the average amount of money spent by all winning, program-funded council candidates for the previous two county elections. Limits the number of candidates in the pilot program to fifteen per election period. Appropriates funds for the pilot program. (HB360 HD1)
Title
Pilot Program; Hawaii County; Public Funding for Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 495) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Wooley. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-13 2:02PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |