HI HB330 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 180, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 180, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for youth suicide early intervention, prevention, and education initiatives. (HB330 CD1)
Title
Relating To Suicide Prevention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-05 | Senate | Act 180, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2019-07-05 | House | Act 180, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 846). |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 947). |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-22-19. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 2). |
2019-04-18 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-22-19. |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 2) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-16 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Nakamura, Eli, Gates, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2019-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-16-19 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 806). |
2019-04-12 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 898). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Eli, Gates, Morikawa, Todd, Ward. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 572). |
2019-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 581) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1730) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 159). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 404) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB226 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27