HI HB2872 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:10PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:10PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of an aerospace high technology district in Hilo. Provides tax incentives to qualified businesses. Repeals 6/30/2022. (SD2)
Title
Aerospace High Technology District
Sponsors
Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 5:10PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 4:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-12 9:30AM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-12 4:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-12 4:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-20-12 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 759). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Fukunaga, Dela Cruz, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Kahele, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Chang, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Choy, Nakashima, Tsuji, Marumoto. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to ERB, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 672) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3351) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from PGM/EDT/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2997) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Tokuda. | |
2012-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-20 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/EDT/WLH deferred the measure until 03-22-12 1:10PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/EDT/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-12 3:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to PGM/EDT/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 315). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Manahan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 1:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Reported from WLO/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 478-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Carroll, Chang, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/EEP on Tuesday, 02-14-12 9:45AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO/EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 280-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO/EEP. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 02-07-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Referred to ERB, WLO/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and passed first reading. |