HI HB275 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB275
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates provisions, repealed on June 30, 2020, relating to service of process and requiring the director public safety to maintain a list of independent civil process servers. Authorizes the use of policer officers and independent civil process servers to process orders and writs for certain causes of action.
Title
Relating To Service Of Process.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB328 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB275 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
HB275 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=275&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB275_.HTM |