HI SB328 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB328

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reinstates provisions, repealed on June 30, 2020, relating to service of process and requiring the director public safety to maintain a list of independent civil process servers. Authorizes the use of policer officers and independent civil process servers to process orders and writs for certain causes of action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Service Of Process.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB275 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB328 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback