HI HB2729 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Act 116, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes standards and criteria for reciprocity for qualifying out-of-state medical cannabis patients and caregivers including limitations, and safeguards. Authorizes extension of written certifications of a debilitating condition for up to three years for chronic conditions. Clarifies a dispensary licensee's right to retest marijuana or manufactured cannabis products for compliance with standards. Authorizes establishment of a bona fide provider-patient relationship via telehealth. Authorizes dispensing of devices that provide safe pulmonary administration of medical cannabis by dispensary licensees. Increases the allowable tetrahydrocannabinol limit for of certain manufactured cannabis products. Limits felony convictions that disqualify an individual from employment with a dispensary licensee. Establishes a working group to make recommendations regarding employment of qualifying patients and manufacture and dispensing of edible cannabis products. (HB2729 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cannabis For Medical Use.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10HouseAct 116, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
2018-07-10SenateAct 116, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1217).
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
2018-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
2018-05-01SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
2018-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 172-18).
2018-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
2018-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 172-18) as amended in (CD 1).
2018-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, San Buenaventura, Kobayashi, Belatti; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Tupola.
2018-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2018-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2018-04-24SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 663).
2018-04-23HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Johanson, San Buenaventura, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Belatti, Tupola.
2018-04-23HouseRe-referred to HHS, LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 63
2018-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 804).
2018-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Espero.
2018-04-13SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608).
2018-04-12HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-10HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 769) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-04-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18.
2018-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3577) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2018-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 10:50AM in conference room 211.
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2018-03-23SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3203) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2018-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-21-18 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2018-03-09SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2018-03-09SenateRe-Referred to CPH, WAM.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to CPH/JDC, WAM.
2018-03-06SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-06SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 253).
2018-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 919-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-23HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Nakamura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Lowen, Todd, Tupola, Ward.
2018-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-16HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-16HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 747-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2018-02-15HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
2018-02-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2018-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
2018-02-09HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 256-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2018-02-08HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2018-02-07HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-18 11:30AM in conference room 329.
2018-02-07HouseThe committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-18 at 11:30 AM in room 329.
2018-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-07-18 10:30AM in House conference room 329.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to HHS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB2718 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback