HI HB2712 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, on or before 9/1/2018, that the Department of Health adopt rules for underground storage tanks and tank systems to conform with certain federal regulations and that include additional requirements for field-constructed underground storage tanks and tank systems. (HB2712 HD1)
Title
Relating To Underground Storage Tanks.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHS. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, McKelvey, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Yamane; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EEP, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2930 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).