HI HB2709 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a personal representative of a decedent appointed under the Uniform Probate Code to notify the police department of the appropriate county of any and all firearms in an estate. Requires the police department to certify that all registered firearms in an estate and other firearms of which the police department has been notified are properly transferred or disposed of before the estate may close. Takes effect 12/1/2020. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Uniform Probate Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 609) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3762) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-30-20 9:46AM in conference room 016. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3556) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 113). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Eli, Kong, McDermott, Say voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-19 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 02-27-20. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor amendment adopted as amended HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused. |
2020-02-19 | House | Floor Amendment No. 1 offered by Rep. Takayama. |
2020-02-18 | House | Deferred one day 02-19-20. |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from PVM/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 678-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Yamane, Thielen. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:15PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-31 | House | Re-referred to PVM/JUD, referral sheet 12 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to PVM, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |