HI HB2696 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Lahaina Recovery Oversight Commission within the Department of Accounting and General Services to oversee and guide the recovery of Lahaina from the 2023 wildfires. Requires the Commission, with the assistance of the Office of Enterprise Technology Services, to establish a website to serve as an information clearing house and public forum. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates moneys. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Takes effect 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Lahaina Wildfire Recovery.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from GVO/LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3179) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 3:20PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LBT, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 171). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 840-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL/JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/JHA on Monday, 02-12-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2979 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation
DAGS
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Lahaina Recovery Oversight Commission
Maui
OETS
Reports
Wildfire
DAGS
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Lahaina Recovery Oversight Commission
Maui
OETS
Reports
Wildfire