HI HB2684 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 201, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 201, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Public Utilities Commission to hire two full-time enforcement personnel. (HB2684 CD1)
Title
Relating To Motor Carriers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 201, 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 201, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1310). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 180-18). |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 180-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, K. Kahele, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, McDermott. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 3:01PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Kahele, English Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Quinlan, McDermott. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 764) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3647) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-18 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 249). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 434-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, McDermott. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-12-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 168-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-02-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |