HI HB2676 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on 3/1/2021, requires health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for a comprehensive category of reproductive health services, drugs, devices, products, and procedures. Prohibits discrimination in the provision of reproductive health services. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Health Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-27-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2539 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36