HI HB2652 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of Hawaii taxable estate to provide that the marital deduction under section 2056 of the Internal Revenue Code shall apply to the passage of any interest in property to any immediate family member. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 424). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Kila, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (6) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Ichiyama, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson excused (5). |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 750-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3289 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and none excused.