HI HB2648 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period that a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from March 31, 2019, to December 31, 2020. Allows a county with a population equal to or less than five hundred thousand that adopts a surcharge on state tax to use surcharge revenues for disaster relief.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2686 (Same As) 2020-02-19 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2648&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2648_.HTM |