HI SB2686 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period that a county may adopt a surcharge on state tax, under certain conditions, from 3/31/2019 to 9/30/2020. Allows a county with a population equal to or less than five hundred thousand that adopts a surcharge on state tax to use surcharge revenues for disaster relief. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported from PSM/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRS, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2648 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5