HI HB2619 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish and periodically revise energy storage portfolio standards and report to the Legislature. Effective July 1, 2014. (HB2619 HD1)
Title
Energy Storage Portfolio Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-25 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 467-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, Nishimoto, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano. |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-11-14 11:35AM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-14 at 11:15AM. |
2014-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-04-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |