HI HB2612 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to AEN/HRE/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to AEN/HRE/CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the University of Hawaii Water Resources Research Center, in cooperation and consultation with the Department of Health, to conduct a statewide study of sewage contamination in nearshore marine areas. Appropriates moneys. (HB2612 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HRE/CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 243). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 02-14-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HHS with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 160-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HHS. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EEP, HHS, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |