HI HB2598 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to establish paid family leave for all workers by January 1, 2021. Requires reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; English. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 749) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Inouye). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3679) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3206) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 362). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1060-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2990 (Same As) 2018-07-06 - Act 109, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).