HI HB2593 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - (H) Act 149, on 6/21/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - (H) Act 149, on 6/21/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the conditions under which emergency administrative rules may be adopted to include instances of imminent peril to natural resources. Effective July 1, 2012. (HB2593 CD1)
Title
Administrative Procedure; Emergency Rules
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | (H) Act 149, on 6/21/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251). | |
2012-06-21 | (S) Act 149, 6/21/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1251). | |
2012-05-07 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 31-12). | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-26 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 31-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-24 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Dela Cruz, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Keith-Agaran, Har, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Riviere. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-12 3:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 759). | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Dela Cruz, Hee, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Coffman, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Har, Nakashima, Riviere. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 640) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Deferred until 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) One Day Notice 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Waived referral to JDL. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from ENE/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2948) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-12 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to ENE/WLH, JDL. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 256). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 914-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Herkes. | |
2012-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-12 2:01PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Reported from WLO/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Carroll, Chang, Har, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Carroll, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/EEP on Friday, 02-10-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to WLO/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2855 (Same As) 2012-02-17 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.