HI HB2557 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an association to offset any amount that it owes a unit owner against the amount of the assessment prior to an alternative power of sale foreclosure.
Title
Foreclosure; Associations
Sponsors
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-25 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-24-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB2978 (Same As) 2014-02-19 - The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2557&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2557_.HTM |