HI HB2526 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 259, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 259, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 3/1/2013, requires reporting by telecommunications and cable television providers to the department of commerce and consumer affairs and requires confidentiality for certain information and reports submitted. (SD2)
Title
Telecommunications and Cable Television Providers; Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 259, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 259, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1362). | |
2012-05-02 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 719). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 712). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-12-12 | |
2012-04-26 | (H) The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, McKelvey, Yamashita, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Har. | |
2012-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-12 4:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-25-12 4:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 763). | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Baker, Wakai, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, Slom. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, McKelvey, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Har, Yamashita, Marumoto. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Re-referred to CPC, ERB, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 547). | |
2012-04-12 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 632) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3332) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. | |
2012-03-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) Reported from EDT/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2944) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Slom. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/CPN deferred the measure until 03-19-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to EDT/CPN, WAM. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 233). | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Marumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Manahan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 851-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-28 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2012-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ching, Fontaine, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Coffman, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching, Marumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, McKelvey. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-06-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-12. | |
2012-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 01-30-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2788 (Same As) 2012-02-14 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.