HI HB2524 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the In Vitro Fertilization Insurance Coverage Study Group to examine health insurance policies and current statutes and to make policy recommendations to the Legislature prior to the convening of the 2019 legislative session. (HB2524 HD1)
Title
Relating To In Vitro Fertilization Insurance Coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 556-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 175-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-02 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Friday, 02-02-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2633 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM.