HI HB2513 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 1:35PM; Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 1:35PM; Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deposits funds into the Rental Housing Revolving Fund to be used to provide loans or grants to mixed-income rental projects or units for persons and families with incomes between 60 and 100% of the median family income. Enables the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to use any unused moneys for other authorized rental housing projects. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Rental Housing Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 1:35PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 2:08PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 883). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 864) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3944) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Wakai, Fevella. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3356) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-17-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 356). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 315-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, Clark, Ilagan, Kitagawa, LoPresti, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Affordable Housing
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation
Rental Housing Revolving Fund