HI HB2508 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows funding for rental or lease of facilities under legislative appropriations and bond authorizations to the State Public Charter School Commission for the design, planning, construction, repair, and maintenance of public charter school improvements. Appropriates general funds for infrastructure costs, rental or lease assistance, and the repair and maintenance of network infrastructure for charter schools. Effective 7/1/2025. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 2:15PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 2:45PM in conference room 312. |
2018-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 827). |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Kahele Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Todd Co-Chairs; Ohno, Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 738) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3692) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3115) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kim. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 3:15PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 109). |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 569-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-01-31 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 01-31-18 2:05PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |