HI HB2503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for the establishment of a training academy for conservation and resources enforcement officers.
Title
Relating To Conservation Officer And Resources Enforcement Training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3048 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2503&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2503_.HTM |