HI SB3048 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for the establishment of a training academy for conservation and resources enforcement officers, including two full-time equivalent (2.0 FTE) permanent positions. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Conservation Officer And Resources Enforcement Training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 403) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2864) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL/LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2347) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2503 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - Referred to WAL, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9