HI HB2481 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Act 134, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Act 134, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Time Share Commissioners of Deeds. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Time Share Commissioners Of Deeds.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | Act 134, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235). |
2024-07-02 | House | Act 134, on 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 47-24). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 47-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Rhoads, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Nakashima, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2024-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 725). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Richards, Awa. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Sayama Chair; Nakashima, Pierick. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 625) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3750) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3286) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 392). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Belatti, Gates. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-06-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3170 (Same As) 2024-02-28 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.