HI HB2481 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 710).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 710).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii high impact center for commercialization in the high technology development corporation. Makes an appropriation. Effective 1/20/2050. (SD2)
Title
Hawaii High Impact Center for Commercialization (HI-Impact); High Technology Development Corporation; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 710). |
2014-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Choy, Takayama Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Taniguchi, Kidani Co-Chairs; Dela Cruz, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 651) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3273) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TEC/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3052) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Ihara, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 2:00PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to TEC/HRE, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 191). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-18 | House | Re-referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 137-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Ito, Ohno, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy, Onishi, Wooley; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Awana. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2624 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.