HI HB248 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies procedural, disclosure, notice, and other requirements for prospective reviews required by health carriers or utilization review organizations prior to certification of coverage for health care services. (HB248 HD2)
Title
Relating To Health Insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 543) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Yamane. |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB248 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).