HI HB2473 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to operate and approve conservation bank and conservation in-lieu fee mitigation programs. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Conservation Mitigation Programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 03-20-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Poepoe voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Lowen, Perruso voting no (4) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 831-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 477-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-09 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Evslin, Holt, Souza. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-09-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2). |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 138-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3162 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to WTL, WAM.