HI HB2470 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii innovations fund to provide grants to individuals or businesses that conduct research or product development in the life sciences or advanced technology fields; establishes objectives of the fund; establishes the Hawaii innovations fund community board; appropriates funds for the start-up and administration of the fund.
Title
Hawaii Innovations Fund; Establishment; Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-14 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2470&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2470_.HTM |