HI HB2443 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:45PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:45PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the sunset date of the authorization for primary caregivers to cultivate medical cannabis for qualifying patients. Clarifies that primary caregivers may continue to cultivate medical cannabis for qualifying patients subject to certain restrictions. Increases the maximum number of qualified patients for which each location used to cultivate cannabis may cultivate cannabis from five to ten patients. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:45PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 4:45PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 2:45PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 2:45PM; Conference Room 325. |
2024-04-19 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 724). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee Added: Senator Shimabukuro added as Conferee. |
2024-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-22-24 2:45PM in conference room 325. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 760). |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 689). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole, Rhoads, Lee Co-Chairs. |
2024-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Gates, Belatti, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Takenouchi, Souza. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 612) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3668) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-24 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 380). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Poepoe; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Garrett, Matayoshi, Perruso, Sayama, Takayama excused (5). |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 468-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-02-09 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-09-24 10:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kapela, Nakashima excused (4). |
2024-02-05 | House | Reported from JHA/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 50-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, Woodson. |
2024-01-31 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA/AGR on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA/AGR, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3132 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.