HI HB2442 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Act 048, 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1148).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Act 048, 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1148).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counties to take into custody any abandoned vehicle on a public road within ten business days. Amends the conditions that constitute a derelict vehicle. Allows, rather than requires, that abandoned vehicles be disposed of by public auction. (HB2442 CD1)
Title
Relating To Abandoned Vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Act 048, 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1148). |
2018-06-20 | House | Act 048, on 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1148). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 80-18). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 80-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Taniguchi, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Nishimoto, Gates; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 3:30PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-18 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2018-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 811). |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Nishihara, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Shimabukuro. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Gates, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 546). |
2018-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 570) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3414) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Ihara. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-18 10:00AM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 342). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1063-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-22-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-14 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2018-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-14-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2479 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 35