HI HB2422 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 043, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Act 043, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that sentences for domestic violence intervention for abuse-related offenses shall be imposed, with or without probation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Sentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Act 043, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143). |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Act 043, 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143). |
2022-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741). |
2022-04-21 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela voting no (2) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2). |
2022-04-21 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 736). |
2022-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 879). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Misalucha, Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 856) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Gabbard, Ihara, Moriwaki. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3853) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha, Fevella. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:25PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-18-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 348). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 777-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3166 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to HMS, JDC.