HI HB24 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a percentage of fees paid into the condominium education trust fund shall be used to support mediation of condominium related disputes. Effective July 1, 2030. (HB24 HD2)
Title
Condominiums; Condominium Education Trust Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 159). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2013-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 491) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Evans, Ito, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Har. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-13. |
2013-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-13. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB505 (Same As) 2013-06-26 - Act 187, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1290).