HI HB2398 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the landfill buffer zone from one-half mile to one-quarter mile.
Title
Relating To Landfills.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-03-22 9:05AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2769 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2398&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2398_.HTM |