HI HB2391 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all persons offering aerosol spray paint containers for sale to restrict public access to the containers so that access to them cannot be gained without employee assistance. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
Aerosol Paint Containers; Graffiti
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-25 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-14. |
2014-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-19-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-19-14. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 7 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2391&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2391_.HTM |