HI HB2370 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-15 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies requirements to establish a quorum to do business and validate acts of the Stadium Authority. Takes effect 4/14/2112. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Stadium Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 590) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3728) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3244) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 357). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett, Holt, Kahaloa, Lowen, Nishimoto, Quinlan, Todd excused (9). |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 648-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-02-14 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama. |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-14-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3059 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 16