HI HB2358 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from environmental impact statement requirements certain affordable housing projects. Takes effect 7/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Environmental Impact Statements.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HOU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Hashimoto, Aquino, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HOU/AEN, WAM. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 351). |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Ganaden, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Perruso, Poepoe, Tam voting no (7) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 879-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Poepoe; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-26-24 12:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cochran, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Poepoe voting no (4) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5). |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from HSG/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 612-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-15 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Kahaloa, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Perruso, Ward. |
2024-02-15 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila. |
2024-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/EEP on Thursday, 02-15-24 10:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HSG/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3047 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.