HI HB235 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 124, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that the authorized benefit for acupuncture treatments allowed under personal injury protection benefits provided through motor vehicle insurance shall be tied to the charges, and any subsequent increases in charges, permissible under the workers' compensation supplemental medical fee schedule. (HB235 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11HouseAct 124, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225).
2017-07-11SenateAct 124, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225).
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 126).
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Luke, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 11:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-20SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Ruderman.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Belatti, Luke Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Ward.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 556) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-07SenateOne Day Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-07SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1553) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-31SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2017-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-31-17 9:40AM in conference room 211.
2017-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 1:30PM in conference room 211.
2017-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-03-20SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 932) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2017-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 87).
2017-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 959), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-23HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Kobayashi, Nakamura; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Tokioka.
2017-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
2017-02-17HouseReported from CPC/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 702) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-13HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Tupola.
2017-02-13HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2017-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on CPC/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17 at 2:00PM.
2017-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2017-01-30HouseRe-referred to CPC/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
2017-01-23HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2017-01-20HousePass First Reading
2017-01-19HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback