HI HB2347 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "profits from prostitution" to include money or property received regardless of expenditures or if it was a reimbursement or repayment of a debt. Amends the sex trafficking and promoting prostitution criminal offense statutes by inserting relevant definitions in those statutes and repealing a statute that is no longer needed.
Title
Relating To Offenses Against Public Health And Morals.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3036 (Same As) 2024-04-16 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2347&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2347_.HTM |