HI HB2340 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 096, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Act 096, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Protective Act so that when an assessment is required, the Department of Human Services is authorized to conduct criminal history record checks, without consent, of an alleged perpetrator of harm or threat of harm and all adult household members living in the family home with the alleged victim child. (HB2340 CD1)
Title
Child Protective Act; Criminal History Record Checks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Act 096, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197). |
2016-06-22 | House | Act 096, on 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197). |
2016-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 32-16). |
2016-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-16. |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 32-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Rhoads, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro. |
2016-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday, 04-25-16 at 1:30PM in Conference Room 229. |
2016-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-21-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Riviere. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Oshiro, McDermott. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 601) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3577) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-06-16 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-05-16 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2914) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 293). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-02 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-03-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 537-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-18 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2869 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.