HI HB2332 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 211, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 211, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the granting of easements on undeveloped public lands affecting the transfer of public lands between the Department of Land and Natural Resources to the Department of Agriculture, pursuant to Chapter 166E, HRS, to be exempted from formal subdivision process and approval requirements, including requirements for surveying and formalizing easements. Limits exemptions to easements created for a public purpose on public or government-owned lands. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Easements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 211, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 211, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312). |
2022-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 741). |
2022-04-21 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey excused (2). |
2022-04-21 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 736). |
2022-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-22. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 847) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3930) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Misalucha. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-22 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from WTL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3487) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL/GVO, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 210). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi voting no (1) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Wildberger; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 287-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kong, McDermott. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-10-22 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |