HI HB2330 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-29 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Commission Special Fund law to increase from $1,000,000 to $3,000,000 the balance that may be retained in the Public Utilities Commission Special Fund at the end of each fiscal year.
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Special Fund; General Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2859 (Same As) 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2330&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2330_.HTM |