HI SB2859 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Commission Special Fund law to increase from $1,000,000 to an unspecified sum the balance that may be retained in the Public Utilities Commission Special Fund at the end of each fiscal year. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Special Fund; General Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1259-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Yamane. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-21-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-16 2:00PM. |
2016-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 281) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2769) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Same As) 2016-01-29 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 4